EP1211472 - Radiator for drying and/or warming towels and household linens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deltacalor S.r.L. Via Mazzini 23801 Calolziocorte (Lecco) / IT | [2005/15] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Deltacalor S.r.L. Via Donatori di sangue, 38 20050 Verano Brianza (Milan) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pastorino, Giovanni Via Carlo Cattaneo, 31 23900 Lecco / IT | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Carloni, Franco Calvani, Salvi & Veronelli S.r.l. Piazza Luigi di Savoia, 2 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Carloni, Franco c/o Calvani, Salvi & Veronelli S.r.l., Piazza Duca d'Aosta, 4 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01124088.4 | 10.10.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI00676U | 01.12.2000 Original published format: IT MI000676 U | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211472 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211472 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211472 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04, F28F9/26 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
F28F9/001 (EP);
A47K10/06 (EP);
F24D19/0293 (EP);
F24H3/002 (EP);
F28D1/05316 (EP);
F28F9/262 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] | Title | German: | Heizkörper zur Trocknung und/oder Erwärmung von Handtüchern und Wäsche | [2002/23] | English: | Radiator for drying and/or warming towels and household linens | [2002/23] | French: | Radiateur pour le séchage et/ou le chauffage de serviettes et du linge | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 29.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2005 | BE | 16.03.2005 | CH | 16.03.2005 | FI | 16.03.2005 | LI | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | TR | 16.03.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 10.10.2005 | IE | 10.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2695466 (NUSSBAUM CIE SA R [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0695530 (COZIER MURIEL COLLEEN [GB]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]DE29909686U (ARBONIA AG [CH]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |