EP1199874 - System and method for controlling mass storage class digital imaging devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camara, Franc. J. 10411 176th Place N.E. Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Yuan, Po 2627 N.E.25th Street Renton, Washington 98056 / US | 03 /
Sadovsky, Vladimir 13549 N.E. 54th Place Bellevue, Washington 98005 / US | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124147.8 | 10.10.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | US20000240772P | 17.10.2000 Original published format: US 240772 P | US20010949166 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: US 949166 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199874 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199874 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
H04N1/00973 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem und -Verfahren für digitale Abbildungvorrichtungen der Massenspeicherklasse | [2002/17] | English: | System and method for controlling mass storage class digital imaging devices | [2002/17] | French: | Système et procédé de commande d'appareils d'imagerie numériques de la classe à mémoire de masse | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0330044 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US5459867 (ADAMS PHILLIP M [US], et al) [A] 10,16,17 * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 19 *; | [A]WO9529465 (SANDIA CORP [US], et al) [A] 8,10 * page 28, line 19 - line 34 *; | [A]US5548783 (JONES CRAIG S [US], et al) [A] 10 * column 1, line 10 - line 15 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 20 *; | [A]EP0859326 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US5845147 (VISHLITZKY NATAN [US], et al); | [A]WO9960786 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [XA]US6115771 (BORN RICHARD M [US]) [X] 1-7,11-13,18,19 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 6 * * column 5, line 55 - line 60 * * column 6, line 59 - line 60 * [A] 8,9,14,15 | by applicant | US5548783 | US6115771 |