EP1202001 - Ventilator fan for an air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerenski, Robert 35 Frisbie Terrace Holley, NY 144701 / US | 02 /
Jensen, Carl E. 75 Warrington Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 03 /
Laluk, David J. 118 Lynx Court Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | WAGNER & GEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124334.2 | 22.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | US20000699581 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: US 699581 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1202001 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1202001 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/007, F04D29/42 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
F24F7/007 (EP,US);
F04D29/4213 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | F24F7/007 | Designated contracting states | DE [2005/17] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gebläseanordnung für ein Klimatisierungssystem | [2002/18] | English: | Ventilator fan for an air conditioning system | [2002/18] | French: | Ventilateur soufflant pour un système de conditionnement d'air | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 05.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, FR, GB, IT, NL | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2710700 (ABB FLAKT [FR]) [X] 7 * page 5, line 24 - page 9, line 31; figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [A]WO9735460 (THERMALLOY INC [US]) [A] 7 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5788566 (MCANALLY ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 2, line 41 - line 61; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6017185 (KUO DAH-CHYI [TW]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 9 - line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]GB2352509 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 7* page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 5; figure 3 *; | [PX]US6182460 (HERNANDEZ NESTOR [MX], et al) [PX] 7 * column 4, line 22 - line 44; figures 5,6 * |