EP1205814 - Electrophotographic carrier, developer using the same, and its use for developing electrostatic images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/20] | Electrophotographic carrier, developer using the same, and developing method | ||
[2010/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/28] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohba, Katsunori 1-306, Eminence Oyama, 12-21, Otome 3-chome Oyama-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kogawara, Toshiro 5058-1, Iwatsuki Iwatsuki-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Isonaka, Takeshi 26-7, Nakatsuma 5-chome Ageo-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Amaya, Shinji 4-1-604, Minamiurawa 1-chome Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124339.1 | 22.10.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | JP20000328679 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000328679 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205814 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205814 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/113, G03G9/10 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
G03G9/1131 (EP,US);
G03G9/12 (KR);
G03G9/1085 (EP,US);
G03G9/1136 (EP,US);
G03G9/1139 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrophotographische Trägerteilchen, sowie Entwickler und Anwendung zur Entwicklung elektrostatische Bilder | [2010/03] | English: | Electrophotographic carrier, developer using the same, and its use for developing electrostatic images | [2010/03] | French: | Agent de véhiculation électrophotographique, agent de développement et son utilisation pour le dévelopement d'images électrostatiques | [2010/03] |
Former [2002/20] | Elektrophotographische Trägerteilchen, sowie Entwickler und Entwicklungsverfahren, die diese einsetzen | ||
Former [2002/20] | Electrophotographic carrier, developer using the same, and developing method | ||
Former [2002/20] | Agent de véhiculation électrophotographique, ainsi qu' agent de développement et système de développement l' utilisant | Examination procedure | 16.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6136489 (TAKEHARA TAKATSUGU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 34 - line 36; examples 1-3; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US5496673 (SAITOH TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 46; example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US5672455 (YANAGIDA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 19 - line 33; examples 1,4,7; claims 1-14 *; | [X]EP0424136 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 8 - line 50; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0974873 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 26, line 23 - line 25; example 1 * * page 26, line 32 - line 34 * |