EP1275771 - Screen apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIKAWA IRON WORKS CO., LTD. 191 Yunoki Shizuoka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states AIKAWA IRON WORKS CO., LTD. 191 Yunoki Shizuoka 420 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aikawa, Yoshihiko 3-17-17 Ando Shizuoka / JP | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124380.5 | 24.10.2001 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | JP20010211687 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001211687 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1275771 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1275771 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21D5/02 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B07B1/20 (EP,US);
D21D5/02 (KR);
D21D5/026 (EP,US);
B07B2230/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/08] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Siebvorrichtung | [2003/03] | English: | Screen apparatus | [2003/03] | French: | Appareil de tamisage | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0486905 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4237151 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9506159 (TAMPELLA OY VALMET [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5* figure 7 * |