27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
16.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
11.11.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
16.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
09.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
03.12.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
23.11.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.11.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.06.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.06.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.06.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
05.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.04.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
08.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
05.10.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.06.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
05.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
09.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |