EP1219792 - Lash adjustment for use with a valve actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. Intellectual Property Department, 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornell, Sean O. c/o Caterpillar Inc., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 02 /
Dong, Mingchun, (NMI) c/o Caterpillar Inc., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 03 /
Leman, Scott A. c/o Caterpillar Inc., 100 Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 04 /
Martin, David E. c/o Caterpillar Inc., 100 Adams Street Peorio Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 05 /
Shinogle, Ronald D. c/o Caterpillar Inc., 100 NE Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 06 /
Voights, Virl R. c/o Caterpillar Inc., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124671.7 | 16.10.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | US20000740436 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: US 740436 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219792 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219792 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219792 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00, F01L1/24, F01L9/02, F02D13/04, F01L13/06, F01L1/26 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
F01L1/267 (EP,US);
F01L1/20 (EP,US);
F01L13/06 (EP,US);
F01L13/065 (EP,US);
F01L9/10 (EP,US);
F01L2760/004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | F01L13/00, F01L1/24, F01L9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/48] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ventilaktuator mit einem Spielausgleichselement | [2002/27] | English: | Lash adjustment for use with a valve actuator | [2002/27] | French: | Actionneur de soupape avec dispositif de rattrapage de jeu | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4399787 (CAVANAGH MARK S [US]) [X] 1,2,5-11,13,14 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4473047 (JAKUBA STANISLAV [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US4706625 (MEISTRICK ZDENEK S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,13,14 * figure - * * column 3 - column 5 *; | [X]EP0549996 (JACOBS BRAKE TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-9* the whole document *; | [X]US5462025 (ISRAEL MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,13,14 * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US6095115 (FUCHS NEIL [US]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * figure - * * column 8 - column 9 * | by applicant | US5638781 |