Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
22.03.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.12.2006 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.12.2006 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
26.09.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.08.2006 | First examination report | |
05.08.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.09.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.09.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.07.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
26.03.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
26.03.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
28.11.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
26.09.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.03.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
07.03.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |