EP1219720 - Heat and corrosion resistant cast stainless steels with improved high temperature strength and ductility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. Intellectual Property Department, 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maziasz, Philip J., @c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 02 /
McGreevy, Timothy E., @c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 03 /
Pollard, Michael James, @c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 04 /
Siebenaler, Chad W., @c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | 05 /
Swindeman, Robert W., @c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | [2014/37] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
Maziasz, Philip J., c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | ||
02 /
McGreevy, Timothy E., c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | |||
03 /
Pollard, Michael James, c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | |||
04 /
Siebenaler, Chad W., c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | |||
05 /
Swindeman, Robert W., c/o Caterpillar Inc. Intell. Prop. Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124942.2 | 19.10.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | US20000736741 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: US 736741 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219720 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219720 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219720 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/58, C22C38/48 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] | Title | German: | Hitzebeständiger, Korrosionsfester und rostfreier Gussstahl mit guter Warmfestigkeit und Ducktilität | [2002/27] | English: | Heat and corrosion resistant cast stainless steels with improved high temperature strength and ductility | [2002/27] | French: | Acier coulée inoxydable résistant à la chaleur et à la corrosion avec une haute résistance aux températures élevées et ductilité | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2014 | 21.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP09002293.0 / EP2113581 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | IE | 19.10.2014 | LU | 19.10.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | PT | 12.01.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IE | 19.10.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
IE | 19.10.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
SE | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH313006 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-36 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2892703 (FURMAN WALTER F, et al) [X] 1-36 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 3 *; | [X]GB1061511 (INT NICKEL LTD) [X] 1-36 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]US4560408 (WILHELMSSON PER H [SE]) [X] 1-36* claims 1-3; table 1 *; | [X]EP0340631 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-36 * claims 1-8; tables 1,2,5 *; | [X]EP0467756 (AUBERT & DUVAL ACIERIES [FR], et al) [X] 1-36 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0668367 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-36 * claims 1-12 * |