EP1203697 - Vehicle with an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NuCellSys GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2005/49] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Ballard Power Systems AG Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states XCELLSIS GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friebe, Peter, Dr. Weileräcker 10 73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Griesmeier, Uwe Mozartstrasse 17 88677 Markdorf / DE | 03 /
Keppeler, Berthold, Dr. Teckstrasse 45/6 73277 Owen / DE | 04 /
Ludwig, Jürgen Lindenstrasse 13 72658 Bempflingen / DE | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Finkele, Rolf, et al Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management Wilhelm-Runge-Strasse 11, U800 89081 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Finkele, Rolf, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management Wilhelm-Runge-Strasse 11, U800 89081 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | Beyer, Andreas, Dr., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | Kaufmann, Ursula Josefine, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Phys., et al c/o DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP-C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124951.3 | 19.10.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | DE2000154007 | 01.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10054007 | [2002/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1203697 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1203697 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203697 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/00, B60K6/00, F01P3/20, H01M6/50, B60K6/04 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B60K6/32 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60L50/15 (EP,US);
B60L58/30 (EP,US);
F01N3/2006 (EP,US);
F01N3/206 (EP,US);
F01P3/20 (EP,US);
H01M16/006 (EP,US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
F01N2610/04 (EP,US);
F01P2050/24 (EP,US);
H01M8/0606 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/40 (EP,US);
Y10S903/908 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/19] | B60R16/00, B60K6/00, F01P3/20, H01M6/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/12] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einem Antriebsverbrennungsmotor | [2002/19] | English: | Vehicle with an internal combustion engine | [2002/19] | French: | Véhicule avec un moteur à combustion interne | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59213940 ; | [X]JP2000303836 ; | [X]JP8339816 ; | [A]DE4219938 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [A] 3* abstract *; | [X]EP0917976 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [X]DE19913795 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 3, line 53 - column 6, line 21; figure - *; | [X]DE19913794 (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 52; figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850417), vol. 0090, no. 87, Database accession no. (M - 372), & JP59213940 A 19841203 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000303836 A 20001031 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP8339816 A 19961224 (AQUEOUS RES:KK; AISIN AW CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19703171 |