EP1205991 - Process for setting a fuel cell into electrical operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NuCellSys GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2005/49] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Ballard Power Systems AG Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states XCELLSIS GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boneberg, Stefan Hohenneuffenstrasse 32 72660 Beuren / DE | 02 /
Strohmaier, Manfred Weitgassstrasse 13 73275 Ohmden / DE | 03 /
Theis, Erik Hofbaumgärten 16 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Finkele, Rolf, et al Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management Wilhelm-Runge-Strasse 11, U800 89081 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Finkele, Rolf, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management Wilhelm-Runge-Strasse 11, U800 89081 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | Beyer, Andreas, Dr., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Kaufmann, Ursula Josefine, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Phys., et al c/o DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP-C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124952.1 | 19.10.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | DE2000154842 | 04.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10054842 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1205991 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1205991 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205991 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/0631 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/05] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur elektrischen Inbetriebnahme einer Brennstoffzelle | [2002/20] | English: | Process for setting a fuel cell into electrical operation | [2002/20] | French: | Procédé pour la mise en marche électrique d'une pile à combustible | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4473622 (CHLUDZINSKI PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 18 *; | [AD]JPS6345766 ; | [AD]JPH02158061 ; | [A]JPS6188460 ; | [AP]EP1122805 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [AP] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] , [0032] , [0036] - [0038] - [0049] - [0051] * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880722), vol. 012, no. 261, Database accession no. (E - 636), & JP63045766 A 19880226 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900906), vol. 014, no. 413, Database accession no. (E - 0974), & JP02158061 A 19900618 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860909), vol. 010, no. 263, Database accession no. (E - 435), & JP61088460 A 19860506 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |