EP1205429 - Fleet of fork lift trucks and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OM Carrelli Elevatori S.p.A. Viale de Gasperi 7 20020 Lainate (MI) / IT | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states STILL WAGNER GmbH & Co KG Ernst-Wagner-Weg 1-5 72766 Reutlingen-Mittelstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marquart, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Strietweg 23/1 75331 Engelsbrand / DE | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Lang, Michael Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Lang, Michael Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125723.5 | 27.10.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | DE2000155305 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055305 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205429 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205429 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/20, B66F9/075, B62D51/04 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B66F9/0759 (EP);
B62D51/001 (EP);
B62D51/04 (EP);
B66F9/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flurförderzeugflotte und Verfahren zum Herstellen der Flurförderzeugflotte | [2002/20] | English: | Fleet of fork lift trucks and method for production thereof | [2002/20] | French: | Flotte de chariots élévateurs à fourche et procédé de production de celle-ci | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.03.2005 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2319618 (WAGNER KG E) [X] 1,9 * page 14 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,10,11; | [DY]DE19732890 (STILL & SAXBY SARL [FR]) [DY] 2,3,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19541677 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9910271 (CROWN EQUIP CORP [US]) [A] 4-8 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 8, line 26 - line 27 * * figures 1,9 *; | [A]US5520258 (KEMSHALL PAUL A [GB]) [A] 4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19732888 (STILL & SAXBY SARL [FR]) [A] 2,10 * the whole document * |