EP1201414 - Method of manufacturing the sidewall of a pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2009/19] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Ikuji, @c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Yoshikazu, @c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Kikuchi, Naohiko@c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2019/49] |
Former [2002/18] | 01 /
Ikeda, Ikuji, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Yoshikazu, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Kikuchi, Naohiko c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [2019/49] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125788.8 | 29.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | JP20000330854 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000330854 | JP20000361453 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000361453 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1201414 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1201414 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201414 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1201414 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/72, B29D30/50, B29C48/07, B60C13/04 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
B60C13/04 (EP,US);
B29D30/08 (KR);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29D30/72 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/33 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/36] | B29D30/72, B29D30/50 | ||
Former IPC [2002/18] | B29D30/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/49] |
Former [2003/25] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2003/22] | |||
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen der Seitenwände von Fahrzeugreifen | [2002/18] | English: | Method of manufacturing the sidewall of a pneumatic tire | [2002/18] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un flanc de pneumatique | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2010
16.02.2010
ADMISSIBLE PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2010
16.02.2010
ADMISSIBLE PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2010
PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Becher, Claus Thomas, et al, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 16.03.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.09.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.02.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.04.2019 | 02.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.10.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.09.2012 | Appeal received No. T2129/12 | 03.12.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.10.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 26.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | [2020/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP2001347812 ; | [A]GB802898 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1 * page 3, line 96 - page 4, line 55; figures 1,3-5 *; | [XY]GB1048241 (AMERICAN MACH & FOUNDRY) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 88 - page 6, line 123; figures 1-3 * [Y] 13,18; | [X]US3904463 (BOILEAU JACQUES) [X] 7 * column 2, line 20 - line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4067372 (MASSON YVES) [Y] 8-12 * column 2, line 32 - line 68; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0537780 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 13,18 * page 1, line 1 - line 4; figures 2-4 * * column 2, line 2 - line 9 *; | [X]EP0854054 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 4,5 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 11; figures 6-11 *; | [Y]DE19831747 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 8-12 * column 4, line 51 - line 58; figures 2A,2B * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001347812 A 20011218 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [E] 8-12 * abstract * | Opposition | US3503432 | US3799233 | WO8904250 | WO9211131 | JPH10109506 | EP0928680 | EP0943421 | WO0003867 | EP1145832 | EP1211057 | - "chapter 4", CLARK, S., Mechanics of Pneumatic Tires, (1981), pages 203 - 229 |