Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4205849B | Global Dossier | 07.01.2009 | B2 | JP2002137402 | 14.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000335089 | 01.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1203665 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2007 | B1 | EP1203665 | 02.07.2003 | A3 | EP1203665 | 08.05.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2000335089 | 01.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60129911T | 08.05.2008 | T2 | DE60129911D1 | 27.09.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000335089 | 01.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6530647 | 11.03.2003 | B2 | US2002051033 | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000335089 | 01.11.2000 |