EP1203665 - Color ink-jet head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Atsushi, c/o Toshiba Tec K.K. 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | 02 /
Shimosato, Masashi, c/o Toshiba Tec K.K. 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125859.7 | 30.10.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | JP20000335089 | 01.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000335089 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1203665 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1203665 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203665 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/15, B41J2/21, B41J2/14 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B41J2/14201 (EP,US);
B41J2/15 (EP,US);
B41J2/2103 (EP,US);
B41J2202/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/19] | B41J2/15, B41J2/21 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/13] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrfarbiger Tintenstrahlkopf | [2002/19] | English: | Color ink-jet head | [2002/19] | French: | Tête à jet d'encre en couleurs | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1110870 ; | [A]US5455610 (HARRINGTON STEVEN J [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 20 - page 6, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0699535 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 45 - column 8, line 13; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]US5754198 (NISHIKAWA MASAJI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 21 - column 8, line 40; figures 2,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11010870 A 19990119 (TEC CORP) [A] 2,6,10,15 * abstract * |