EP1215418 - Lubrication and cooling system for power receiving and delivery units in an electro-mechanical vehicular transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 300 Renaissance Center Detroit Michigan 48265-3000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states General Motors Corporation 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, Michigan 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Antably, Ahmed M. 8921 Nora Woods Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | 02 /
Shafer Jr., George G. 4904 South Madison Avenue Anderson, Indiana 46013 / US | 03 /
Klemen, Donald 13137 Cheval Court Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126036.1 | 31.10.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | US20000737692 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: US 737692 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1215418 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1215418 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04, H02K9/19 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
B60K6/26 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
F16H57/0412 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
H02K9/19 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
F16H2700/00 (EP,US);
F16H3/727 (EP,US);
F16H57/0476 (EP,US);
F16H57/0484 (EP,US);
Y10S903/906 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/11] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schmier- und Kühlsystem für Kraftaufnahme- und Kraftabgabeeinheiten in einem elektro-mechanischen Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2002/25] | English: | Lubrication and cooling system for power receiving and delivery units in an electro-mechanical vehicular transmission | [2002/25] | French: | Système de lubrification et de refroidissement pour unités de reception et délivrance de puissance dans une transmission électro-mécanique de véhicule | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5111090 (OTAKE SHIN-ICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,19* column 3, lines 18-49 *; | [XY]US5682074 (DI PIETRO CARLO C [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,15-18 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 17 * * column 5, lines 13-46; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 11-14; | [Y]EP0980994 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 11-14 * column 10, line L - column 11, line 15; figures 1,2,4-6 * |