EP1216833 - Method for regulating the ink-fountain solution balance in a rotary offset printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Montataire S.A. Square Hippolyte Marinoni 60160 Montataire / FR | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Heidelberg Web Systems, S.A. Square H. Marinoni 60761 Montataire / FR | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berton, Philippe 37, Rue de l'hotel Guéhain 60140 Bailleval / FR | 02 /
Blanchard, Alain Sente du Clos St. Denis 60270 Gouvieux / FR | 03 /
Boillot, Dominique Raiffeisenstrasse 4B 76344 Eggenstein / DE | 04 /
Chevalier, Antoine 99 Parc du Manoir 60270 Gouvieux / FR | 05 /
Lepeltier, Patrick 63 Rue Laisement 60940 Angicourt / FR | [2002/28] |
Former [2002/26] | 01 /
Berton, Philippe 37, Rue de l'hotel Guéhain 60140 Bailleval / FR | ||
02 /
Blanchard, Alain Sente du Clos St. Denis 60270 Gouvieux / FR | |||
03 /
Boillot, Dominique 1 clos Saint Roman 60220 Gouvieux / FR | |||
04 /
Chevalier, Antoine 99 Parc du Manoir 60270 Gouvieux / FR | |||
05 /
Lepeltier, Patrick 63 Rue Laisement 60940 Angicourt / FR | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/47] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01126423.1 | 08.11.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | DE20001058550 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058550 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216833 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216833 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B41F33/0054 (EP,US);
B41P2233/11 (EP,US);
B41P2233/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung des Farb-zu-Feuchtmittelgleichgewichts in einer Rotations-Offsetdruckmaschine | [2002/26] | English: | Method for regulating the ink-fountain solution balance in a rotary offset printing machine | [2002/26] | French: | Méthode de régulation de l'équilibre encre-solution de mouillage dans une machine d'impression rotative | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 31.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | IE | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | AT | 08.11.2006 | LU | 08.11.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
AT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LU | 08.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
AT | 08.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
AT | 08.11.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3912811 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]DE4436582 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |