|
15.07.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
11.02.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.01.2008 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.11.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |