04.09.2009 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
25.08.2009 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
13.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
28.04.2009 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
15.11.2007 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.11.2007 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.10.2005 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
23.08.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
23.08.2005 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
28.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
28.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.03.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |
18.02.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
21.12.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.02.2004 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
13.02.2004 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
11.09.2003 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
02.08.2003 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
01.08.2003 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
14.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.01.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
30.08.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
23.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.04.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
26.04.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
26.04.2002 |
First examination report |
|
22.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.11.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|