Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1215104 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1215104



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 74
19.04.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.05.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.04.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
04.03.2003 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
18.12.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.10.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.10.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.10.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
08.05.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
26.02.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 4
08.01.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.11.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
10.11.2001 Description Search / examination 7
10.11.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.11.2001 Drawings Search / examination 1
10.11.2001 Priority document Search / examination 16
10.11.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6