blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1215104

EP1215104 - Method for influencing the steering and/or the drive, when required, of a leading or trailing axle in an industrial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Sonderfahrzeuge AG
Brunner Str. 44-50
1230 Wien / AT
[2002/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Pertlik, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Thonetgasse 31/9
1220 Wien / AT
 [2002/25]
Application number, filing date01126510.510.11.2001
[2002/25]
Priority number, dateAT2000000207414.12.2000         Original published format: AT 20742000
[2002/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1215104
Date:19.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1215104
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2002
ClassificationIPC:B62D7/14, B60K17/36, B62D61/10
[2002/25]
CPC:
B62D7/144 (EP); B62D61/10 (EP); B60K17/30 (EP);
B60K17/36 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2003/11]
Former [2002/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Einflussnahme auf die Lenkung und/oder den bedarfsweisen Antrieb einer Vor- oder Nachlaufachse in einem Nutzfahrzeug[2002/25]
English:Method for influencing the steering and/or the drive, when required, of a leading or trailing axle in an industrial vehicle[2002/25]
French:Procédé pour influer sur la direction et/ou l'entrainement suivant les besoins d'un essieu poussé ou trainé dans un véhicule utilitaire[2002/25]
Examination procedure24.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
23.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2002Fee for grant paid
18.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1630277  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE2338197  (BISCHOFF JOHANN FRIEDRICH) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2554993  (TOENSE BODO) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 2-29; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2066182  (SCOTTORN TRAILERS LTD) [A] * column 2, lines 13-35; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4467886  (DECLAIRE GERALD [US], et al) [A] * figure 2; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0934864  (VEENHUIS VOERTUIGTECHNIK B V [NL]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.