EP1312746 - Extraction-preventing retainer for roll-up blinds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baruffaldi, Mauro Via Pioppa, 329/A 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01126532.9 | 14.11.2001 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312746 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/165 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
E06B9/165 (EP);
E06B2009/1572 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/07] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Längliche Ausziehsicherung für Rolltore | [2003/21] | English: | Extraction-preventing retainer for roll-up blinds | [2003/21] | French: | Fixation contre extraction longitudinale pour volets roulants | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/35] | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB894260 (HENRI MARTINAGE) [X] 1 * figures 3-6; claim 1 *; | [X]FR1558556 (DOTTI U & U) [X] 1* figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]FR2614929 (BUBENDORFF RICHARD [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 3; claims 3,4 * |