EP1205939 - Near-field microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jasco Corporation 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states JASCO CORPORATION 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states JASCO CORPORATION 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narita, Yoshihito, c/o Jasco Corporation 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Shigeyuki, c/o Jasco Corporation 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126657.4 | 08.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | JP20000345372 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000345372 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1205939 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1205939 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205939 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G12B21/06 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G01Q10/06 (EP,US);
G01Q30/06 (EP,US);
G01Q60/22 (EP,US);
Y10S977/862 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/33] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nahfeldmikroskop | [2002/20] | English: | Near-field microscope | [2002/20] | French: | Microscope à champ proche | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0795770 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 7, line 3 * * column 7, line 34 - column 9, line 7 * * figures 1,2,5-7 *; | [X]EP0864899 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 51 * * column 15, line 31 - column 16, line 38 * * column 19, line 4 - column 20, line 48 * * figures 1,11 *; | [X]EP0622652 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 16 *; | [X]US5473157 (GROBER ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 18 * * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 17 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US5827660 (SINGER ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 49 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 17 *; | [A]US5883712 (COFFIN JOHN M [US]) [A] 3 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0503236 (IBM [US]) [A] 12 * abstract * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 9 * | [X] - YASUSHI INOUYE ET AL, "NEAR-FIELD SCANNING OPTICAL MICROSCOPE WITH A METALLIC PROBE TIP", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (19940201), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 159 - 161, XP000424356 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 159, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 160, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 160, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 161, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 2,4,5 * | [X] - BACHELOT R ET AL, "NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL MICROSCOPE BASED ON LOCAL PERTURBATION OF A DIFFRACTION SPOT", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (19950915), vol. 20, no. 18, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1924 - 1926, XP000528383 [X] 1-15 * page 1924, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 1925, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1926, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,4 * | [X] - FUJIMURA T ET AL, "Observation of local light propagation in ordered LATEX layers by scanning near-field optical microscope", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19970801), vol. 48, no. 1-2, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 94 - 102, XP004115949 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 95, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 96, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(97)00087-1 |