EP1207347 - Method for controlling a gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL B.V. Laarderhoogtweg 18-20 1101 EA Amsterdam Z.O. / NL | [2002/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vegter, Derk Zijtak W.Z. 130 Nieuw Amsterdam / NL | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/21] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126672.3 | 08.11.2001 | [2002/21] | Priority number, date | DE2000156064 | 11.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10056064 | [2002/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1207347 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1207347 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1207347 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
F23N5/242 (EP);
F23N2005/181 (EP);
F23N2227/16 (EP);
F23N2231/10 (EP);
F23N2233/06 (EP);
F23N2235/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Regeln eines Gasbrenners | [2002/21] | English: | Method for controlling a gas burner | [2002/21] | French: | Procédé pour commander un brûleur à gaz | [2002/21] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 30.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | AT | 08.11.2006 | LU | 08.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
TR | 16.08.2006 | ||
AT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LU | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
AT | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
AT | 08.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SE | 16.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05106831 ; | [A]DE4342481 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0666452 (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE19824524 (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [AD] 1* column 2, line 7 - line 11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930825), vol. 0174, no. 65, Database accession no. (M - 1468), & JP5106831 A 19930427 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9963272 | WO9963273 |