EP1205885 - Electronically codable lock system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRA Gesellschaft für Asset Management mbH & Co. KG Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states ASTRA Gesellschaft für Asset Management mbH & Co. KG Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stobbe, Anatoli Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Postfach 59 31 30059 Hannover / DE | [2002/20] | Application number, filing date | 01126864.6 | 12.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | DE2000156119 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10056119 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1205885 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1205885 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
G07C9/00571 (EP);
G07C9/21 (EP,US);
G07C9/00182 (EP);
G07C9/27 (EP);
G07C2009/00603 (EP);
G07C2009/00753 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/51] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisch codierbares Schloss-System | [2002/20] | English: | Electronically codable lock system | [2002/20] | French: | Système de serrure codable électroniquement | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9314571 (SUPRA PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 8, line 8 * * page 13, line 5 - page 14, line 25 * [Y] 4,8,13; | [XY]US5602536 (HENDERSON WALTER G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 61 - column 8, line 2 * * column 32, line 63 - column 34, line 51 * [Y] 4,6,8,13; | [Y]DE19911221 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBIL [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract ** column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 44 * |