EP1211787 - Electric motor with electronic control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELCO S.p.A. Via Per Orio, 18 24100 Bergamo / IT | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colombo, Enzo Via Palma il Vecchio, 10 24049 Verdello (Bergamo) / IT | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli & C. S.p.A Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/23] | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli & C. s.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01126940.4 | 13.11.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI02549 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: IT MI002549 | [2002/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211787 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211787 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/10, H02P1/46 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
H02K29/08 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K29/10 (EP);
H02P6/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Motor mit elektronischer Steuerung | [2002/23] | English: | Electric motor with electronic control | [2002/23] | French: | Moteur électrique avec commande électronique | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.11.2004 | CY | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | IE | 15.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | LU | 10.01.2005 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | BE | 10.11.2004 | |
CY | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 15.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
LU | 10.01.2005 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | BE | 10.11.2004 | |
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 15.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
LU | 10.01.2005 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 10.11.2004 | |
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 15.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
LU | 10.01.2005 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 10.11.2004 | |
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
LU | 10.01.2005 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 10.11.2004 | |
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | MC | 30.11.2004 | |
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | DK | 10.02.2005 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 10.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2458933 (AUXILEC) [Y] 8-10,17 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 16 ** page 3, line 17 - line 25 *; | [XY]WO0019593 (KOMATSU FUMITO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,13,16,18 [Y] 4,5,8-12,14,15,17; | [Y]EP1052764 (G E C GLOBAL ENGINEERING COMPA [IT]) [Y] 4,5,11,12,14,15 * column 3, line 7 - line 21 * * column 7, line 14 - line 26 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 17 *; | [XP]EP1130757 (KOMATSU FUMITO [JP]) [XP] 1-3,6,7,13,16,18 * column 17, line 3 - column 20, line 9 * |