EP1209959 - Multilayer circuit board and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | [2009/08] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchinono, Yoshiyuki, c/o Matsushita Electric Works 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
Sawada, Kazuo, c/o Matsushita Electric Works 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
Masaki, Yasufumi, c/o Matsushita Electric Works 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
Muto, Masahide, c/o Matsushita Electric Works 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/22] | Application number, filing date | 01126948.7 | 13.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | JP20000360220 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000360220 | JP20000367091 | 01.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000367091 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209959 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209959 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H05K1/183 (EP,US);
H05K3/46 (KR);
H05K1/119 (EP,US);
H05K3/403 (EP,US);
H05K3/4697 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3493 (EP,US);
H05K1/0284 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09045 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09118 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0919 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09645 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/49] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Leiterplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2002/22] | English: | Multilayer circuit board and method of manufacturing the same | [2002/22] | French: | Panneau à circuit multicouches et son procédé de fabrication | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 19.11.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 27.05.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06152098 ; | [A]JPH09153661 ; | [A]JPH10282145 ; | [DA]JPH07249873 ; | [DA]JPH07170077 ; | [A]US3349162 (ECKHARDT JOHN C, et al) [A] 1,3,8,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1124564 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 3,6,8,12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4963697 (PETERSON ROBERT K [US], et al) [A] 1,3,8,12 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 22; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0498258 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8,13* abstract *; | [A]US5640760 (VAL CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,8,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5657537 (SAIA RICHARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,3,8,10,12 * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 9; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US6100178 (TODD MICHAEL GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940829), vol. 018, no. 464, Database accession no. (E - 1598), & JP06152098 A 19940531 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09153661 A 19970610 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10282145 A 19981023 (HOYA CORP) [A] 1,5,8,14 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07249873 A 19950926 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [DA] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07170077 A 19950704 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | US3756891 | JPH06152098 |