Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
01.07.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.12.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.11.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.05.2003 | Change - extension states | |
31.01.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
28.06.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
09.05.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |