Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1216878 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10064574 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10064574 | 17.01.2002 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE10064574 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0105254 | 28.05.2003 | A3 | HUP0105254 | 28.10.2002 | A2 | HU0105254D0 | 28.01.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE10064574 | 22.12.2000 |