EP1213334 - Aqueous coating compositions with phosphonic acid based compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huybrechts, Josef Korenbloemstraat 39 2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | 02 /
Koerner, Michael 3371 Westchester Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 / US | 03 /
Bruylants, Paul Vinkenlaan 39 3191 Hevez / BE | 04 /
Kirshenbaum, Kenneth S. 4160 Wendell Road West Bloomfield, Michigan 48323 / US | [2004/27] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
Huybrechts, Josef Korenbloemstraat 39 2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | ||
02 /
Koerner, Michael Panoramaweg 14 53639 Koenigswinter / DE | |||
03 /
Bruylants, Paul Vinkenlaan 39 3191 Hevez / BE | |||
04 /
Kirshenbaum, Kenneth S. 4160 Wendell Road West Bloomfield, Michigan 48323 / US | Representative(s) | Axalta - Biering/Blum/Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | DuPont Performance Coatings Christine Biering/Christine Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte Abitz und Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127182.2 | 16.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | US20000731305 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: US 731305 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213334 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213334 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C08G59/40, C09D5/38 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
C09D5/38 (EP,US);
C08G59/4071 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31515 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31522 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L2666/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | Wässrige Beschichtungszusammensetzungen die Phosponsäureverbindungen enthalten | [2002/24] | English: | Aqueous coating compositions with phosphonic acid based compounds | [2002/24] | French: | Compositions de revêtement aqueuses comprenant des composés de l'acide phosphonique | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 04.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 21.04.2004 | CY | 21.04.2004 | FI | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | LI | 21.04.2004 | NL | 21.04.2004 | TR | 21.04.2004 | DK | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.07.2004 | SE | 21.07.2004 | PT | 21.09.2004 | IE | 16.11.2004 | LU | 16.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
CY | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
IT | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
TR | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.11.2004 | ||
LU | 16.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
CY | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
TR | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.11.2004 | ||
LU | 16.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
TR | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
LI | 21.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6063261 ; | [X]US4276392 (CHATTHA MOHINDER S) [X] 1-14 * example 6; claim - *; | [A]US4434256 (DWORAK GERT [AT], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - line 68; claim - *; | [A]US5332767 (REISSER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9906450 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1* claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 21, Database accession no. 1985-125343, XP002193675 & JPS6063261 A 19850411 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |