EP1215244 - Solidifying material for cell electrolyte solution, and cell comprising the solidifying material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/25] | Solidifying material for cell electrolyte solution, and cell comprising the solidfying material | ||
[2012/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/43] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD. 7-6 Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takizawa, Minoru, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 02 /
Sugito, Yoshifumi, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 03 /
Oguma, Naomi, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 04 /
Doi, Seiji, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 05 /
Yoshikawa, Sachio, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 06 /
Nakamura, Michiei, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2012/39] |
Former [2002/25] | 01 /
Takizawa, Minoru, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufaturing Co. Ltd., 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | ||
02 /
Sugito, Yoshifumi, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufaturing Co. Ltd., 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | |||
03 /
Oguma, Naomi, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufaturing Co. Ltd., 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | |||
04 /
Doi, Seiji, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufaturing Co. Ltd., 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | |||
05 /
Yoshikawa, Sachio, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufaturing Co. Ltd., 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | |||
06 /
Nakamura, Michiei, Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Manufaturing Co. Ltd., 7-6, Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi, Chou-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127252.3 | 16.11.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000354591 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000354591 | JP20000354592 | 21.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000354592 | JP20010126099 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001126099 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215244 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215244 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1215244 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/00, C08L51/00, H01M10/30, H01M10/34, H01M10/0565, H01M2/16, H01M6/22 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
H01M10/0565 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (KR);
H01M6/22 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0014 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0025 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0085 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T442/2139 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2861 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2918 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F297/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | C08L53/00, C08L51/00, H01M10/30, H01M10/34, H01M10/40 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2008/22] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Feststoffmaterial für Zelle mit Elektrolytlösung | [2002/25] | English: | Solidifying material for cell electrolyte solution, and cell comprising the solidifying material | [2012/19] | French: | Matériau de solidification pour pile contenant une solution electrolytique | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/25] | Solidifying material for cell electrolyte solution, and cell comprising the solidfying material | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2164047 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 5-9 * page 1, lines 22-38 * * page 1, lines 50-51 *; | [X]WO8803154 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [X] 1-4,9 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 24 * * page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 24 * * page 8, lines 23-32 * * page 12, line 4 - page 15, line 13 * * page 16, lines 1-11 * * example 1 *; | [X]JPH07109321 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 5-9 * abstract *; | [X]US5593795 (CHEN KEJIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 6 * * example 1 *; | [X]EP0766329 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, lines 17-32 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2 * * example 1 * * claims 1,3,9 *; | [A]EP1011165 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0025] - [0032] * | by applicant | JPS5556615 | JPH021715 | JPH02265909 | JPH07109321 | WO9803154 | - "Kogyo Zairyo", Tokushu - Netsukasosei Elastomers, (1976), vol. 24 | - Sekiyu Gakkai Shi, (1975), vol. 18, page 565 |