EP1213858 - System for diversity receiver for mitigating the effects of fiber dispersion by separate detection of two transmitted sidebands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [2002/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gnauck, Alan H. 53 Heron Road Middletown, New Jersey 07701 / US | 02 /
Lam, Cedric F. 202 Knollwood Drive Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | 03 /
Woodward, Sheryl L. 7 East Brook Drive Holmdel, New Jersey 07024 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127367.9 | 21.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | US20000722646 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 722646 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213858 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213858 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213858 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H04B10/2507 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/12] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System eines Diversitätsempfängers zur Verringerung der Faserdispersionseffekte durch die Detektion zweier übertragener Seitenbänder | [2002/24] | English: | System for diversity receiver for mitigating the effects of fiber dispersion by separate detection of two transmitted sidebands | [2002/24] | French: | Systeme d'un recepteur de diversite a reduire la dispersion dans les fibres optiques par la detection separee de deux bandes laterales transmises | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 14.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0409260 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 6; figures 3,13 * * page 11, line 52 - page 12, line 23 *; | [A]US5522004 (DJUPSJOEBACKA ANDERS G [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US5793511 (BUELOW HENNING [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 3; figure 5 *; | [A]DE4415176 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 49 - page 4, line 68; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5377035 (WANG HARRY T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |