EP1211858 - Rate matching parameter calculation method, wireless communications base station apparatus, and wireless communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd. 1006, Oazakadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Atsuko 2-20, Nagaura Chita-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | Lang, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127382.8 | 22.11.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | JP20000364195 | 30.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000364195 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211858 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211858 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211858 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H04L1/0068 (EP);
H04L1/0041 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/23] | H04L25/14, H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Datenraten-Parameterberechnung, Basisstation für drahtlose Kommunikation, und drahtloses Kommunikationssystem | [2002/23] | English: | Rate matching parameter calculation method, wireless communications base station apparatus, and wireless communications system | [2002/23] | French: | Procédé de calcul des paramètres de débit, station de base pour communication sans fil, et système de communication sans fil | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2792788 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 11; table 1 *; | [A]WO9965148 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3 * figure 7; claims 1,2,7 * * abstract *; | [PA]EP1139598 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-3 * page 1, line 5 - page 6, line 41 * * abstract *; | [PA]EP1069798 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PA] * abstract * | [AD] - "3rd Generation Partnership Projekt; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (Release 1999)", 3GPP TS 25.212 V3.4.0, (200009), XP002343409 [AD] 1-3 * paragraph [4.2.7.2.2] * | [A] - INSOO SOHN ET AL, "Performance studies of rate matching for WCDMA mobile receiver", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2000. IEEE VTS FALL VTC 2000. 52ND SEPT. 24-28, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000924), vol. 6, ISBN 0-7803-6507-0, pages 2661 - 2665, XP010525071 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [03.1] * |