EP1209362 - Hermetic compressors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suitou, Ken K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Kazuya K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawaguchi, Masahiro K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Sonobe, Masanori K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Matsubara, Ryo K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127387.7 | 22.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | JP20000357967 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000357967 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209362 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209362 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209362 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04C23/00, F04C18/02, F04C29/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
F04C28/08 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F01C21/10 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C29/0085 (EP,US);
F04C29/047 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | F04C23/00, F04C18/02, F04C29/10, F04C29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/48] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hermetischer Verdichter | [2002/22] | English: | Hermetic compressors | [2002/22] | French: | Compresseur hermétique | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]JP2000255252 ; | [Y]EP0933603 (RC GROUP S P A [IT]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1,4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6041609 (HORNSLETH STEEN [DK], et al) [A] 1,18,20 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10017091 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1,18,20 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5904471 (WOOLLENWEBER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1,18,20 * figure 2; claim 1 * | [DXY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000255252 A 20000919 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DX] 18,20 * abstract * [Y] 1-7 |