EP1291364 - Method for the manufacture of exfoliated polymer/silicate nano-composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-ku Taejeon 305-701 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-ku Taejeon 305-701 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Yong Suk 406-1408, Expo Apt., 464-1 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-ku, Taejeon 305-762 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yoon Kyung 3-1309, Samsung Apt., Oryu-dong Jung-ku, Taejeon 301-120 / KR | 03 /
Chung, In Jae 52-104, Hyundai Apt., Abgujeong-dong Kangnam-ku, Seoul 135-110 / KR | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/06] | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127399.2 | 23.11.2001 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | KR20010055942 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001055942 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291364 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291364 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/22, C08F2/44 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C08F2/44 (EP,KR,US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C08F2/22 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/28] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von delamellierten Polymer/Silicat Nanokompositen | [2003/11] | English: | Method for the manufacture of exfoliated polymer/silicate nano-composites | [2003/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation de nano-composites polymère/silicate exfoliées | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6252020 (KUO WEN-FAA [TW], et al); | [A]US5965634 (IDOGAWA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) |