EP1220445 - Transmission power control apparatus and method for suppressing the peak power of the transmission data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shouichi 2-8-16-102, Bessho, Minami-ku Yohohama-shi, Kanagawa 232-0064 / JP | 02 /
Shinde, Hiroki 3-7-26-212, Sugita, Isogo-ku Yohohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0033 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127751.4 | 21.11.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000357709 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000357709 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220445 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1220445 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1220445 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03G11/04, H04B1/707 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04W52/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | H03G11/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/07] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Sendeleistungssteuerung zur Unterdrückung von Spitzenleistung der Datenübertragung | [2002/27] | English: | Transmission power control apparatus and method for suppressing the peak power of the transmission data | [2002/27] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de contrôle de puissance d'émission pour la suppression de puissance de crete des données à transmettre | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0054428 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,7-9,15-17 * figures 8,9,11-14 * * page 8, line 26 - line 36 * * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 21 *; | [X]EP0977355 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,7,9,15,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 58 * * page 5, line 26 - line 29 * * page 5, line 52 - line 58 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0033477 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US5638403 (BIRCHLER MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 * |