EP1217461 - Method and unit for fixing toner on a support, in particular a printing support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states NexPress Solutions LLC 1447 St. Paul Street Rochester, New York 14653-7001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behnke, Knut Schlotfeldtsberg 18 24220 Flintbek / DE | 02 /
Krause, Hans-Otto Jungfernstieg 100 24240 Eckernförde / DE | 03 /
Morgenweck, Frank-Michael Zur Russeer Au 23 24111 Kiel / DE | 04 /
Rohde, Domingo Redderkamp 93 24111 Kiel / DE | 05 /
Schulze-Hagenenst, Detlef Dorfstede 51 24113 Molfsee / DE | 06 /
Bartscher, Gerhard, Dr. Eupener Strasse 54 50933 Köln / DE | 07 /
Preissig, Kai-Uwe Wesselingweg 11 44339 Dortmund / DE | 08 /
Tyagi, Dinesh 18 White Alder Circle Fairport, New York 14450-2625 / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2002/26] | 01 /
Behnke, Knut Hardenbergstrasse 30 24118 Kiel / DE | ||
02 /
Krause, Hans-Otto Pferdemarkt 27 24340 Eckernförde / DE | |||
03 /
Morgenweck, Frank-Michael Hamburger Landstrasse 50 24113 Molfsee / DE | |||
04 /
Rohde, Domingo Redderkamp 93 24111 Kiel / DE | |||
05 /
Schulze-Hagenenst, Detlef Dorfstede 51 24113 Molfsee / DE | |||
06 /
Bartscher, Gerhard, Dr. Aachener Strasse 114 50674 Köln / DE | |||
07 /
Preissig, Kai-Uwe Wesselingweg 11 44339 Dortmund / DE | |||
08 /
Tyagi, Dinesh 18 White Alder Circle Fairport, New York 14450-2625 / DE | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/13] | Lauerwald, Jörg, et al NexPress GmbH Am Kiel-Kanal 2 24106 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Lauerwald, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys., et al c/o Dr.Detlef Schulze-Hagenest NexPress GmbH Postfach 24 60 24023 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | Lauerwald, Jörg Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG TPT-R4 Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127899.1 | 23.11.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | DE2000164565 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064565 | DE2001145005 | 12.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145005 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217461 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217461 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G15/2007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, NL [2007/29] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Fixierung von Toner auf einem Träger bzw. einem Bedruckstoff | [2002/26] | English: | Method and unit for fixing toner on a support, in particular a printing support | [2002/26] | French: | Méthode et unité de fixage de toner sur un support, en particulier un support d'impression | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 16.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE, IT | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5612673 ; | [A]DE1802741 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]US4456368 (ISAKA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,14-16,27 * column 1, line 18 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-5,6A-12C *; | [X]US4482239 (HOSONO NAGAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,14,26,27 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 25 - column 7, line 48; figures 1-7 *; | [DX]US4511778 (TAKAHASHI TOHRU [JP], et al) [DX] 1,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0667732 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,5-7,9,11,14-19,24 * the whole document *; | [X]US5631685 (GOORAY ARTHUR M [US], et al) [X] 1,5,13,14,16,27 * column 1, line 24 - column 3, line 6 * * column 6, line 1 - column 12, line 44; figures 1-14 *; | [L]EP1217462 (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [L] 1-10,12-15,26 * the whole document *; | [L]EP1217460 (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [L] 1-10,12-15,26 * the whole document *; | [L]EP1217459 (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [L] 1-10,12-15,26* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810423), vol. 005, no. 060, Database accession no. (P - 058), & JP56012673 A 19810207 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,14 * abstract * |