EP1211736 - A semiconductor light-emitting element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Yuji c/o NGK Insulators,LTD., 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Shibata, Tomohiko c/o NGK Insulators,LTD., 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Mitsuhiro c/o NGK Insulators,LTD., 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Oda, Osamu c/o NGK Insulators,LTD., 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128134.2 | 27.11.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | JP20000364268 | 30.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000364268 | JP20010321052 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001321052 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211736 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211736 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
H01L33/06 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/12 (EP,US);
H01L33/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung | [2002/23] | English: | A semiconductor light-emitting element | [2002/23] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur émetteur de lumière | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0437385 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [Y]US5684309 (MCINTOSH FORREST GREGG [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 52 * * column 3, lines 19-27 * * column 6, line 58 - column 8, line 14; figures 5-9 *; | [Y] - DAMILANO B ET AL, "From visible to white light emission by GaN quantum dots on Si(111) substrate", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19990816), vol. 75, no. 7, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 962 - 964, XP012024601 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124567 | [A] - ROUVIÈRE J L ET AL, "Preferential nucleation of GaN quantum dots at the edge of AlN threading dislocations", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19991025), vol. 75, no. 17, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2632 - 2634, XP012023839 [A] 3,6,13,16 * abstract * * page 2632, column 1, lines 4-25; figure 1 * * page 2633, column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 4; figure 2 * * page 2634, column 2, lines 5-16; figure 3 * * page 2634, column 2, lines 28-36, paragraph CONCLUSION * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.125101 | [A] - HIRAYAMA HIDEKI ET AL, "Intense photoluminescence from self-assembling InGaN quantum dots artificially fabricated on AlGaN surfaces", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19980406), vol. 72, no. 14, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1736 - 1738, XP012019948 [A] 10-12,17 * abstract * * page 1737, column 1, lines 14-16 * * page 1737, column 1, lines 19-23; figure 1 * * page 1737, column 2, lines 3-24; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.121168 | [A] - WIDMANN F ET AL, "Growth kinetics and optical properties of self-organized GaN quantum dots", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19980615), vol. 83, no. 12, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 7618 - 7624, XP012044403 [A] 3,6,9-13,16 * abstract * * page 7618, column 2, paragraphs 2-4 - page 7619, paragraph 1 * * page 7621, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 6 * * page 7622, column 1, paragraphs 2,4; figure 9 * * page 7623, column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 20; figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.367878 | [A] - OHBA Y ET AL, "GROWTH OF HIGH-QUALITY A1N AND A1N/GAN/A1N HETEROSTRUCTURE ON SAPPHIRE SUBSTRATE", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO, JP, (19960815), vol. 35, no. 8B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L1013 - L1015, XP000733038 [A] 7,8 * abstract * * page L1014, column 1, lines 12-22, paragraph 2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.35.L1013 | [A] - AKIO YAMAMOTO ET AL, "NITRIDATION EFFECTS OF SUBSTRATE SURFACE ON THE METALORGANIC CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION GROWTH OF INN ON SI AND X-AL2O3 SUBSTRATES", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940401), vol. 137, no. 3/4, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 415 - 420, XP000501163 [A] 9 * abstract * * page 416, column 2, lines 1-3 * * page 419, column 1 - column 2; figures 6,7b * * page 420, column 1, lines 1-19 * * page 420, column 2, lines 3-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(94)90979-2 | by applicant | US5684309 | JPH11354839 | - DAMILANO B, "From visible to white light emission by GaN quantum dots on Si(lll) substrate", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19990816), vol. 75, no. 7 |