11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
03.08.2018 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
04.05.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
29.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.05.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.04.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
08.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.01.2010 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
31.07.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
23.12.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
06.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |