EP1213218 - Suspension device for two-wheeled vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2008/22] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Kouji, c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/52] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
Sakai, Kouji, c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128917.0 | 05.12.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | JP20000371656 | 06.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000371656 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213218 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213218 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213218 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62K25/04 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B62K25/04 (EP);
B62K2025/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | Aufhängungsvorrichtung für ein Zweiradfahrzeug | [2002/24] | English: | Suspension device for two-wheeled vehicle | [2002/24] | French: | Dispositif de suspension pour véhicule à deux roues | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | IE | 05.12.2008 | LU | 05.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
TR | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
LU | 05.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
LU | 05.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
LU | 05.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09193641 ; | [X]JPH0672127 ; | [XD]JPH08132846 ; | [A]JPS60154907 ; | [X]DE9415009U (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0891884 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [XP]EP1099577 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09193641 A 19970729 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940617), vol. 018, no. 319, Database accession no. (M - 1623), & JP06072127 A 19940315 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08132846 A 19960528 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [XD] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851214), vol. 009, no. 319, Database accession no. (M - 439), & JP60154907 A 19850814 (YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH08132846 | JP2000003385 |