EP1217268 - Metal laminate gasket with continuous bead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIKAWA GASKET CO. LTD. 5-5 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states ISHIKAWA GASKET CO. LTD. 5-5 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soichi, Isogai, Ishikawa Gasket Co., Ltd. 44-18, Senju Okawa-cho Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129375.0 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | JP20000386995 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000386995 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217268 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217268 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217268 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
F16J15/0825 (EP,US);
F16J15/06 (KR);
F16J2015/0837 (EP,US);
F16J2015/0856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/40] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrlagenmetalldichtung mit kontinuierlichem Dichtungswulst | [2002/26] | English: | Metal laminate gasket with continuous bead | [2002/26] | French: | Joint métallique à feuilles superposées présentant un bourrelet continu | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.04.2006 | IT | 05.04.2006 | GB | 18.12.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/51] | IT | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 18.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 05.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19531232 (ELRINGKLINGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0430163 (ISHIKAWA GASKET [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 30; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US4998741 (UDAGAWA TSUNEKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figure - * |