EP1229314 - Liquid level gauge with removable hall device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rochester Gauges, Inc. 11616 Harry Hines Boulevard Dallas Texas 75229 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Rochester Gauges, Inc. 11616 Harry Hines Boulevard Dallas Texas 75229 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ross, Herbert G., Jr. 140 Fawn Hollow Drive Argyle, Denton, TX 76226 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129384.2 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | US20010758857 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: US 758857 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1229314 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1229314 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/38 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G01F23/34 (EP,US);
G01F23/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsstandanzeiger, mit einer abnehmbaren Hall-Effektanordnung | [2002/32] | English: | Liquid level gauge with removable hall device | [2002/32] | French: | Jauge de niveau de liquide comprenant un dispositif à effet hall amovible | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 08.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR938617 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE) [X] 1-6,10-15,23,24,27 * page 3, lines 15-45 *; | [A]US3739641 (HUSKEY E, et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0578299 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1,2,5-11,14-28 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 34 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 47 * * column 9, line 18 - column 10, line 7 * * figures 1-4,11,12 *; | [YX]EP0593085 (SCULLY SIGNAL CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-11,14-28 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 24 - column 8, line 48 * * figures 1-5 * [X] 29,30; | [A]EP1028239 (CTS CORP [US]) [A] 1-30 * column 3, line 11 - column 7, line 7; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | FR938617 | EP0578299 | EP0593085 | US5570118 | US5982170 |