EP1215826 - Method and system for selecting a diversity branch according to intra-cell and inter-cell handover combining schemes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagata, Yoshinori NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129500.3 | 11.12.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000377681 | 12.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000377681 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215826 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215826 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1215826 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02, H04B7/04 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
H04B7/0491 (EP,US);
H04B7/022 (EP,US);
H04B7/0857 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/28] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Auswahl eines Diversitäts-Zweiges gemäss Kombinierverfahren für Inner-Zell- und Zwischen-Zell-Weiterreichen | [2002/25] | English: | Method and system for selecting a diversity branch according to intra-cell and inter-cell handover combining schemes | [2002/25] | French: | Procédé et système pour la sélection d'une branche de diversité selon des procédés de combinaison pour le transfert intracellulaire et intercellulaire | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 30.09.2005 | [2006/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5742911 (DUMBRILL MICHAEL JAMES [GB], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 2, line 42 - line 62 *; | [A]GB2328589 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-32 * page 2, line 5 - line 22 ** page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 10 *; | [A]US5933787 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 12 *; | [A]US6154653 (JUNG JIN SOO [KR]) [A] 1-32 * column 2, line 5 - line 54; figure 1 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 11 * |