Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1215400 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1215400



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 136
16.04.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
01.04.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
04.02.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
16.01.2004 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
28.10.2003 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
19.05.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.04.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.06.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.06.2002 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.05.2002 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.04.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.04.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
01.02.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 Priority document Search / examination 25
01.02.2002 Priority document Search / examination 23
25.01.2002 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
14.12.2001 Description Search / examination 12
14.12.2001 Drawings Search / examination 8
14.12.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
13.12.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
13.12.2001 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 25