blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1215400

EP1215400 - Parts to be joined in a non-positive manner, non-positive joining of such two parts and process for manufacturing such parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Desch Antriebstechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Kleinbahnstrasse 21
59759 Arnsberg / DE
[2002/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Volbers, Thomas
Im Tabrock 1
59494 Soest / DE
02 / Mauer, Georg, Dr.-Ing.
Hahnenweide 19c
47918 Tönisvorst / DE
03 / Desch, Alexander P
Kleinbahnstr 21
59759 Arnsberg / DE
 [2002/35]
Former [2002/32]01 / Volbers, Thomas
Im Tabrock 1
59494 Soest / DE
02 / Mauer, Georg, Dr.-Ing.
Kasselberg 6
52441 Limmich / DE
03 / Desch, Alexander P
Kleinbahnstr 21
59759 Arnsberg / DE
Former [2002/25]01 / Volbers, Thomas
Im Tabrock 1
59494 Soest / DE
02 / Mauer, Georg Dr.-Ing.
Kasselberg6
52441 Limmich / DE
03 / Desch, Alexander P
Kleinbahnstr 21
59759 Arnsberg / DE
Representative(s)Basfeld, Rainer, et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/25]Basfeld, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9
59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE
Application number, filing date01129678.713.12.2001
[2002/25]
Priority number, dateDE200016222613.12.2000         Original published format: DE 10062226
DE200111756507.04.2001         Original published format: DE 10117565
[2002/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1215400
Date:19.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1215400
Date:14.05.2003
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2003
ClassificationIPC:F16B2/00
[2002/25]
CPC:
F16B2/005 (EP); F16D1/033 (EP); F16D1/076 (EP);
F16D1/08 (EP); F16D1/09 (EP); F16D2001/0903 (EP);
F16D2300/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/06]
Former [2002/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftschlüssig miteinander verbindbare Bauteile, kraftschlüssige Verbindung von zwei solchen Bauteilen, und Verfahren zur Herstellung von solchen Bauteilen[2002/25]
English:Parts to be joined in a non-positive manner, non-positive joining of such two parts and process for manufacturing such parts[2002/25]
French:Pièces assemblables à force, assemblage à force de deux telles pièces et procédé de fabrication de telles pièces[2002/25]
Examination procedure16.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
01.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE29521198U  (KREBSOEGE GMBH SINTERMETALL [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 6,9,10;
 [Y]EP0961038  (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,9,10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0961038
 DE19921890
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.