EP1215732 - Nonvolatile semiconductor memory device and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states HALO LSI DESIGN AND DEVICE TECHNOLOGIES INC. 169 Meyers Corner Road, Suite 230 Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states HALO LSI DESIGN AND DEVICE TECHNOLOGIES INC. 169 Meyers Corner Road, Suite 230 Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | |||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Halo Lsi Design and Device Technology Inc. 169 Myers Corners Road, Suite 230 Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Nobuyo 3-9-405, Matsunami-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8102 / JP | 02 /
Odanaka, Shinji 1-51-12, Higashinakaburi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0093 / JP | 03 /
Fujimoto, Hiromasa 5-1-3-23-302, Kabutodai, Kizu-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | 04 /
Ogura, Seiki, Halo LSI Design and Device Tech.Inc. 169 Myers Corners Road Suite 230 Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129725.6 | 13.12.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000382233 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000382233 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215732 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215732 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/788 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H01L29/66825 (EP,US);
H01L29/788 (KR);
H01L29/40114 (EP,US);
H01L29/42324 (EP,US);
H01L29/7885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | H01L29/788, H01L29/423, H01L21/336 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/50] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtige Halbleiterspeicheranordnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2002/25] | English: | Nonvolatile semiconductor memory device and manufacturing method thereof | [2002/25] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur de mémoire rémanent et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/24] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.10.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0530644 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [Y]US5591652 (MATSUSHITA TADASHI [JP]); | [A]EP0905790 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0935293 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US6121655 (ODANAKA SHINJI [JP], et al) |