EP1319928 - Indicator for perishable goods with preceding period data input, interrupt, variable recording, Arrhenius equation, data transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M General Offices St. Paul, P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuepper, Anton Jupiterstrasse 13 41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Romann, Karl-Heinz Clara-Schumann-Strasse 30 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E. 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E. 3M Deutschland GmbH, Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129831.2 | 14.12.2001 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1319928 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01D9/00, G07C3/00, G01K3/04, G06F17/60 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
G01K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G01D9/00 (KR);
G01D9/007 (EP,KR,US);
G07C3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/11] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anzeiger für verderbliche Waren mit Dateneingang für die vorherige Periode, Unterbrechung, variabler Aufzeichnung, Arrhenius Gleichung, Datenübermittlung | [2003/25] | English: | Indicator for perishable goods with preceding period data input, interrupt, variable recording, Arrhenius equation, data transmission | [2003/25] | French: | Indicateur pour des marchandises périssables avec une entrée pour les données de la période précédente, interruption, enregistrement variable, équation Arrhenius, transmission des données | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 15.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4061033 (NIXON PETER ANTHONY) [X] 21* column 6, line 10 - line 31 *; | [X]GB2259768 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 14,20 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE19535719 (RENNER PETER DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 13,19 * column 1, line 52 - line 65 *; | [A]GB2323169 (IND TEXTILES & PLASTICS LIMITE [GB], et al) [A] 1,17 * claim 1 *; | [X]US6185513 (PLETTNER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 12,18 * claim 1 * |