EP1245268 - Process and device for removing sulfur compounds from a gas stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breuer, Norbert, Dr. Johann-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 11 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
Waidner, Jürgen Hoelderlinstrasse 7 73274 Notzingen / DE | 03 /
Schiller, Christian, Dr. Matth.-Gruenewald-Strasse 18 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 04 /
Lehr, Walter, Dr. Landauerstrasse 57B 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Hebner, Thomas Paul-Linke-Strasse 37 70195 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/40] | Application number, filing date | 01130050.6 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | DE2001115220 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10115220 | [2002/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1245268 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1245268 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/48, B01D53/04, C10L3/10 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B01D53/0407 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (EP);
B01D2253/112 (EP);
B01D2257/30 (EP);
B01D2257/304 (EP);
B01D2259/40084 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/40] | B01D53/48 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/16] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Schwefelverbindungen aus einem Gasstrom | [2002/40] | English: | Process and device for removing sulfur compounds from a gas stream | [2002/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour éliminer des composés de soufre d'un flux gaseux | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/44] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.03.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5114689 (NAGJI MOEZ M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,13-15 * column 1, line 29 - line 46 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 23 * * column 13, line 25 - line 35 * * column 13, line 59 - column 14, line 19 *; | [DX]US5354362 (SOWINSKI RICHARD F [US]) [DX] 1,2,5,7,8,13-15 * column 2, line 41 - line 50 * * column 3, line 8 - line 56 * * column 4, line 10 - line 26 * * column 5, line 31 - line 42 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 31; figures 1,5 *; | [X]US5271907 (COPELAND ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,4-8,12-15 * column 25, line 65 - column 26, line 64; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP1121977 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,7,8,13-15 * page 2, line 7 - line 10 * * page 2, line 20 - line 25 * * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, line 19 - line 28 * |