Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
31.01.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.12.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
05.12.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
07.11.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.08.2003 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.08.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
15.11.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
18.10.2002 | Correction of patent application | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
18.10.2002 | Change - applicant | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
09.05.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |