EP1244203 - Power converter circuit for generators with dynamically varying outputpower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/34] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreiber, Dejan Hans-Sachs-Strasse 18 90513 Zirndorf / DE | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 01130145.4 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | DE2001114075 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114075 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244203 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1244203 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244203 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02J3/38, H02M5/458, H02M7/493 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
H02M7/493 (EP,US);
H02J3/38 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02M5/458 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | H02M5/257, H02M7/48, H02M5/458 | ||
Former IPC [2002/39] | H02M5/257 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Stromrichterschaltungsanordnung für Generatoren mit dynamisch veränderlicher Leistungsabgabe | [2002/39] | English: | Power converter circuit for generators with dynamically varying outputpower | [2002/39] | French: | Circuit convertisseur pour des générateurs avec puissance variable dynamiquement | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | AT | 19.12.2013 | IE | 19.12.2013 | LU | 19.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | GR | 03.01.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
AT | 19.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
AT | 19.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
AT | 19.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06217553 ; | [Y]WO9311604 (US WINDPOWER [US]) [Y] 2 * column A * * page 20, line 3 - line 10 * * page 69, line 23 - line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5315159 (GRIBNAU WILHELMUS H J K [NL]) [A] 2 * column A * * column 2, line 4 - line 7 *; | [Y]DE19614627 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * column A * * column 4, line 53 - line 61 * * figure 7 *; | [A]EP0891037 (ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]) [A] 8 * page 3, line 3 ** figure 1 *; | [XY]WO0021186 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * column A * * page 10, line 7 - line 18; figures 1,2,4b * [Y] 2,8; | [A]DE19941170 (WEH HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column A * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 1 * * column 4, line 45 - line 65 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941109), vol. 018, no. 586, Database accession no. (E - 1627), & JP06217553 A 19940805 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [A] 1,8 * column A * | by applicant | WO9311604 | DE19614627 | WO0021186 |